ID H0111 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Agricultural Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Agricultural Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to animal care to define a term; to establish provisions relating to committing torture to companion animals and to provide that certain officers may take possession of companion animals subjected to torture; and to establish provisions relating to penalties for certain violations.
Title
Amends existing law relating to animal care to define a term; to establish provisions relating to committing torture to companion animals and to provide that certain officers may take possession of companion animals subjected to torture; and to establish provisions relating to penalties for certain violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Agricultural Affairs |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-04-01 | House | to Senate |
2013-04-01 | House | Title apvd |
2013-04-01 | House | PASSED -- 54-14-2 |
2013-04-01 | House | Read third time in full as amended |
2013-03-29 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-28 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-28 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2013-03-27 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2013-03-27 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2013-03-27 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2013-03-13 | House | U.C. to be returned to Agricultural Affairs Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2013-02-07 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |