ID H0100 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 54 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 54 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the Pea and Lentil Commission to revise composition and appointment provisions relating to the Idaho Pea and Lentil Commission.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the Pea and Lentil Commission to revise composition and appointment provisions relating to the Idaho Pea and Lentil Commission.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 54 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-03-10 | Delivered to Governor on 03/09 | |
2011-03-09 | To Governor | |
2011-03-08 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-07 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-07 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-04 | To enrol | |
2011-03-03 | to House | |
2011-03-03 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-03 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2011-03-02 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-02 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-01 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-01 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-01 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-09 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-02-09 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-09 | Senate intro | |
2011-02-08 | to Senate | |
2011-02-08 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-08 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 66-0-4 | |
2011-02-07 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-07 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-04 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-04 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-03 | to printing | |
2011-02-03 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-03 | House intro |