ID H0083 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-07 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-07 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
REVENUE AND TAXATION -- Amends existing law to provide that a new construction roll shall show certain reductions in taxable market value and to provide for exceptions; and to establish provisions regarding a certain amount that shall be subtracted from the dollar amount of property taxes certified for an annual budget.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that a new construction roll shall show certain reductions in taxable market value and to provide for exceptions; and to establish provisions regarding a certain amount that shall be subtracted from the dollar amount of property taxes certified for an annual budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-02-06 | House | to Senate |
2017-02-06 | House | Title apvd |
2017-02-06 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 59-11-0 |
2017-02-03 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2017-01-31 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |