ID H0075 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - March 24, 2015 Session Law Chapter 95 Effective: 07/01/2015 Section 1; 07/01/2016 Section 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - March 24, 2015 Session Law Chapter 95 Effective: 07/01/2015 Section 1; 07/01/2016 Section 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SALES TAX - Amends existing law to exempt eyeglasses, eyeglass component parts and contact lenses from sales tax.
Title
Amends existing law to exempt eyeglasses, eyeglass component parts and contact lenses from sales tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | March 24, 2015 Session Law Chapter 95 Effective: 07/01/2015 Section 1; 07/01/2016 Section 2 |
2015-03-19 | House | Law without signature |
2015-03-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:45 a.m. on March 18, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2015-03-16 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-13 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2015-03-12 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-12 | Senate | PASSED -- 18-17-0 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-02-17 | House | to Senate |
2015-02-17 | House | Title apvd |
2015-02-17 | House | PASSED -- 57-12-1 |
2015-02-17 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-02-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2015-02-03 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |