ID H0074 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide for off-highway vehicles.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to provide for off-highway vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Ret’d to House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read third time in full -- FAILED 13-22-0 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-02-21 | House | to Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Title apvd |
2019-02-21 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 51-16-3 |
2019-02-20 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-19 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |