ID H0068 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2019 Session Law Chapter 75 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

RETIREMENT -- Amends existing law to conform provisions regarding retirement and early retirement allowance calculations for state legislators to the decision of the Citizens' Committee on Legislative Compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to conform provisions regarding retirement and early retirement allowance calculations for state legislators to the decision of the Citizens' Committee on Legislative Compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2019 Session Law Chapter 75 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-08HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:45 a.m. on March 7, 2019
2019-03-07HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-06SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-06SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-05HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-04HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-01Senateto House
2019-03-01SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-01SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 32-0-3
2019-02-26SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-25SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-14SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2019-02-14SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-13Houseto Senate
2019-02-13HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-13HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2
2019-02-12HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-11HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-08HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-31HouseReported Printed and Referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback