ID H0047 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2015 Session Law Chapter 86 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2015 Session Law Chapter 86 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LAND BOARD - Amends existing law to provide that certain revenue from navigable waterways shall be deposited in the Navigable Waterways Fund, to provide that certain moneys shall be deposited in the Waterways Improvement Fund at the beginning of each fiscal year and to provide that royalties from extraction of minerals from navigable waterways shall be deposited in the Public School Permanent Endowment Fund.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that certain revenue from navigable waterways shall be deposited in the Navigable Waterways Fund, to provide that certain moneys shall be deposited in the Waterways Improvement Fund at the beginning of each fiscal year and to provide that royalties from extraction of minerals from navigable waterways shall be deposited in the Public School Permanent Endowment Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2015 Session Law Chapter 86 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-03-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:45 a.m. on March 18, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2015-03-16 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-13 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2015-03-12 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-12 | Senate | PASSED -- 24-11-0 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-02-06 | House | to Senate |
2015-02-06 | House | Title apvd |
2015-02-06 | House | PASSED -- 48-18-4 |
2015-02-06 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-02-05 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-01-29 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |