ID H0030 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2019 Session Law Chapter 299 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2019 Session Law Chapter 299 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMES -- Amends existing law to provide for the appointment or designation of an evaluation committee when a criminal defendant's alleged incompetency may be the result of a developmental disability.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for the appointment or designation of an evaluation committee when a criminal defendant's alleged incompetency may be the result of a developmental disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2019 Session Law Chapter 299 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-04-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 8:10 a.m. on April 3, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2019-04-01 | House | to enrol |
2019-04-01 | House | Title apvd |
2019-04-01 | House | Read third time in full as amended in Senate -- PASSED 69-0-1 |
2019-03-29 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2019-03-27 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2019-03-27 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration for concurrence recommendation |
2019-03-27 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended |
2019-03-26 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-01-28 | House | to Senate |
2019-01-28 | House | Title apvd |
2019-01-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0 |
2019-01-25 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |