ID H0013 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to establish a duty to account for and pay over any use tax liability imposed on a taxpayer if that responsible party exercises certain control over management of the taxpayer.
Title
Amends existing law to establish a duty to account for and pay over any use tax liability imposed on a taxpayer if that responsible party exercises certain control over management of the taxpayer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2013-03-26 | House | Erpelding |
2013-03-26 | House | 19-50-1 AYES -- Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Burgoyne, Chew, Collins, Denney, Erpelding, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Meline, Pence, Ringo, Rusche, Smith, Trujillo, VanOrden, Ward-Engelking, Woodings NAYS -- Agidius, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Clow, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Nielsen, Packer, Patterson, Perry, Raybould, Romrell, Shepherd, Sims, Stevenson, Thompson, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Youngblood, Mr. Speaker Absent and excused -- Palmer Floor Sponsor |
2013-03-26 | House | FAILED |
2013-03-26 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 64 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 6, read three times |
2013-03-25 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2013-01-16 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |