IA SSB3178 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2368
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2368.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2368.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the authority of counties and cities to regulate rental housing, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the authority of counties and cities to regulate rental housing, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2368. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2020 3:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Quirmbach, and Segebart. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Local Government. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB690 (Related) 2020-02-17 - Subcommittee Meeting: Upon Adjournment House Lounge.
SF2368 (Replaced by) 2020-06-04 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 645.
SF2368 (Replaced by) 2020-06-04 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 645.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3178 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3178.html |