IA SF2368 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 645.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 645.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the authority of counties and cities to regulate rental housing, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3178.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the authority of counties and cities to regulate rental housing, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3178.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 645. |
2020-03-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-03-11 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2020 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-03-10 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Jones and Wilburn. H.J. 588. |
2020-03-09 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 519. |
2020-03-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 448. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 500. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 30, nays 17. S.J. 498. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Amendment S-5051 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 497. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 403. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 392. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3178 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2368.
HSB690 (Related) 2020-02-17 - Subcommittee Meeting: Upon Adjournment House Lounge.
HSB690 (Related) 2020-02-17 - Subcommittee Meeting: Upon Adjournment House Lounge.