IA SSB3160 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the sealing of information that is a part of the record of a case of marriage dissolution.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the sealing of information that is a part of the record of a case of marriage dissolution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2020 3:00PM RM G17. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Carlin, Bolkcom, and Greene. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3160 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3160.html |