IA SSB3145 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2354
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2381
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2381
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2354.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2354.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to pregnancy support including by creating the more options for maternal support program and expanding Medicaid postpartum coverage and making appropriations.(See SF 2354, SF 2381.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to pregnancy support including by creating the more options for maternal support program and expanding Medicaid postpartum coverage and making appropriations.(See SF 2354, SF 2381.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2354. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2022 2:00PM Room G15. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Costello, Edler, and Jochum. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
SF2354 (Replaced by) 2022-04-04 - NOBA: Senate Full Approps
SF2381 (Replaced by) 2022-05-24 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 0-0
SF2381 (Replaced by) 2022-05-24 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 0-0
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3145 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3145.html |