IA SSB3127 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2066
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2300
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2300
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring the department of human services to facilitate a workgroup study relating to certain mandatory reporter training and certification requirements.
Title
A bill for an act requiring the department of human services to facilitate a workgroup study relating to certain mandatory reporter training and certification requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2018 12:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2018 2:00PM RM 315 (Cancelled) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee: Segebart, Shipley, and Ragan. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
SF2066 (Replaced by) 2018-01-23 - Subcommittee: Segebart, Chelgren, and Mathis. S.J. 145.
SF2300 (Replaced by) 2018-03-14 - Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 587.
SF2300 (Replaced by) 2018-03-14 - Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 587.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB3127 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB3127.html |