IA SF2066 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - Subcommittee: Segebart, Chelgren, and Mathis. S.J. 145.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - Subcommittee: Segebart, Chelgren, and Mathis. S.J. 145.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring the department of human services to facilitate a workgroup study relating to certain mandatory reporter training and certification requirements.
Title
A bill for an act requiring the department of human services to facilitate a workgroup study relating to certain mandatory reporter training and certification requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Matt McCoy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Segebart, Chelgren, and Mathis. S.J. 145. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 125. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3127 (Related) 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2300 (Similar To) 2018-03-14 - Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 587.
SF2300 (Similar To) 2018-03-14 - Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 587.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2066 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2066.html |