IA SSB3120 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2264
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2512
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2512
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2264.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2264.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to county zoning procedures, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to county zoning procedures, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2264. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2020 1:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Hogg, and Kraayenbrink. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Local Government. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB632 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 313.
SF2264 (Replaced by) 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. S.J. 514.
HF2512 (Replaced by) 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 627.
SF2264 (Replaced by) 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. S.J. 514.
HF2512 (Replaced by) 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 627.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3120 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3120.html |