IA HF2512 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 627.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to county zoning procedures, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 632.) Effective date: 06/01/2020. Applicability date: 07/01/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to county zoning procedures, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 632.) Effective date: 06/01/2020. Applicability date: 07/01/2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Passed House (Y: 66 N: 29 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-01HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 627.
2020-06-03HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 626.
2020-03-04HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 450.
2020-03-04SenateImmediate message. S.J. 515.
2020-03-04SenatePassed Senate, yeas 37, nays 11. S.J. 513.
2020-03-04SenateSubstituted for SF 2264. S.J. 513.
2020-02-27SenateRead first time, attached to companion SF 2264. S.J. 467.
2020-02-27SenateMessage from House. S.J. 467.
2020-02-27HouseImmediate message. H.J. 405.
2020-03-03HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 443.
2020-03-02HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 416.
2020-02-27HousePassed House, yeas 66, nays 29. H.J. 403.
2020-02-24HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 334.

Same As/Similar To

HSB632 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 313.
SSB3120 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2264.
SF2264 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. S.J. 514.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback