IA SSB3072 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2298
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to pharmacy regulation, including the composition of the board of pharmacy and the wholesale distribution of prescription drugs and devices, and including penalties.
Title
A bill for an act relating to pharmacy regulation, including the composition of the board of pharmacy and the wholesale distribution of prescription drugs and devices, and including penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2018 10:30AM RM 315 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee: Greene, Segebart, and Mathis. S.J. 156. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
SF2298 (Replaced by) 2018-05-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087.
SSB3096 (Related) 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2018 2:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge (Cancelled)
SSB3096 (Related) 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2018 2:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge (Cancelled)
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB3072 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB3072.html |