IA SSB3096 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2298
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2018 2:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge (Cancelled)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2018 2:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge (Cancelled)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to pharmacy regulation, including the composition of the board of pharmacy and the wholesale distribution of prescription drugs and devices, and including penalties.
Title
A bill for an act relating to pharmacy regulation, including the composition of the board of pharmacy and the wholesale distribution of prescription drugs and devices, and including penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2018 2:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge (Cancelled) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee: Greene, Segebart, and Quirmbach. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
SF2298 (Replaced by) 2018-05-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087.
SSB3072 (Related) 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SSB3072 (Related) 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB3096 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB3096.html |