IA SSB3068 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the administration of the statewide summative assessment of student progress to students of online schools by school districts, accredited nonpublic schools, and charter schools.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the administration of the statewide summative assessment of student progress to students of online schools by school districts, accredited nonpublic schools, and charter schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2024 12:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Gruenhagen, Celsi, and Westrich. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3068 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3068.html |