IA SSB3065 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SJR2002
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SJR 2002.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SJR 2002.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A joint resolution designating the American cream draft horse as the official state horse of the State of Iowa.(See SJR 2002.)
Title
A joint resolution designating the American cream draft horse as the official state horse of the State of Iowa.(See SJR 2002.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SJR 2002. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2024 2:00PM Room 315. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sweeney, Green, and Knox. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON NATURAL RESOURCES AND ENVIRONMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SJR2002 (Replaced by) 2024-03-18 - Placed on calendar. H.J. 607.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3065 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3065.html |