IA SSB3060 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2315
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2490
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2490
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2315.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2315.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to probate indigent defense fees and trial transcript fees.(See SF 2315.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to probate indigent defense fees and trial transcript fees.(See SF 2315.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2315. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2022 2:00PM Room G17. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Boulton, and Rowley. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB586 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2490.
SF2315 (Replaced by) 2022-03-23 - Attached to companion HF 2490. S.J. 595.
HF2490 (Replaced by) 2022-03-23 - Read first time, attached to companion SF 2315. S.J. 595.
SF2315 (Replaced by) 2022-03-23 - Attached to companion HF 2490. S.J. 595.
HF2490 (Replaced by) 2022-03-23 - Read first time, attached to companion SF 2315. S.J. 595.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3060 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3060.html |