IA SSB3054 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2042
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2386
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2386
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to disclosure of psychological test material.
Title
A bill for an act relating to disclosure of psychological test material.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2022 1:30PM Room G15. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee: Taylor, J., Bolkcom, and Reichman. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HF2042 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2386.
HF2386 (Replaced by) 2022-03-07 - Amendment H-8142 filed. H.J. 505.
HF2386 (Replaced by) 2022-03-07 - Amendment H-8142 filed. H.J. 505.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3054 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3054.html |