IA HF2042 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2386.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2386.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to disclosure of psychological test material.(See HF 2386.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to disclosure of psychological test material.(See HF 2386.)
Sponsors
Rep. Dustin Hite [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2386. |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 212. |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2022 1:15PM RM 19. |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Jacobsen and Olson. H.J. 117. |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 99. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3054 (Related) 2022-02-02 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF2386 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Amendment H-8142 filed. H.J. 505.
HF2386 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Amendment H-8142 filed. H.J. 505.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2042 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2042.html |