IA SSB3051 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2282
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2282.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2282.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to robbery in the first degree and the applicable statute of limitations.(See SF 2282.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to robbery in the first degree and the applicable statute of limitations.(See SF 2282.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2282. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2024 3:00PM Room 315. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Webster, Evans, and Quirmbach. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SF2282 (Replaced by) 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 583.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3051 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3051.html |