IA SSB3049 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2124
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2140
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2140
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2140.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2140.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to airport registration and site approval by the department of transportation.(See SF 2140.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to airport registration and site approval by the department of transportation.(See SF 2140.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2140. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2022 1:30PM Room G17. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Koelker, Driscoll, and Smith, J. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB548 (Related) 2022-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2124.
HF2124 (Replaced by) 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 852.
SF2140 (Replaced by) 2022-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 582.
HF2124 (Replaced by) 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 852.
SF2140 (Replaced by) 2022-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 582.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3049 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3049.html |