IA HF2124 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 852.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 852.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to airport registration and site approval by the department of transportation. (Formerly HSB 548.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to airport registration and site approval by the department of transportation. (Formerly HSB 548.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 852. |
2022-04-21 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 851. |
2022-03-22 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 603. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 584. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 582. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2140. S.J. 581. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 553. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read first time, attached to companion SF 2140. S.J. 358. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 358. |
2022-02-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 319. |
2022-02-21 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, 0 nays. H.J. 311. |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 127. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB548 (Related) 2022-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2124.
SSB3049 (Related) 2022-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2140.
SF2140 (Similar To) 2022-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 582.
SSB3049 (Related) 2022-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2140.
SF2140 (Similar To) 2022-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 582.