IA SSB3032 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2375
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2375.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2375.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the statute of limitations period for criminal and civil actions for sexual abuse in the first, second, or third degree.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the statute of limitations period for criminal and civil actions for sexual abuse in the first, second, or third degree.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2375. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2020 4:30PM RM G17. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Dawson, and Petersen. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SF2375 (Replaced by) 2020-02-25 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3032 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3032.html |