IA SSB3016 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2221
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2329
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2329
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2329.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2329.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the admissibility of evidence in a prosecution for physical abuse or a sexual offense upon or against a child, person with an intellectual disability, person with a cognitive impairment, or person with a developmental disability.(See SF 2329.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the admissibility of evidence in a prosecution for physical abuse or a sexual offense upon or against a child, person with an intellectual disability, person with a cognitive impairment, or person with a developmental disability.(See SF 2329.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2329. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2022 10:00AM Room G17. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, Garrett, and Kinney. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB522 (Related) 2022-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2221.
HF2221 (Replaced by) 2022-03-08 - Senate amendment H-8160 filed. H.J. 509.
SF2329 (Replaced by) 2022-03-08 - Withdrawn. S.J. 462.
HF2221 (Replaced by) 2022-03-08 - Senate amendment H-8160 filed. H.J. 509.
SF2329 (Replaced by) 2022-03-08 - Withdrawn. S.J. 462.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3016 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3016.html |