IA SSB3015 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2408
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2334
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2334
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2334.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2334.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicles, including the surrender or transfer of registration plates and cards to a county treasurer, documentary fees charged by motor vehicle dealers, and motor vehicle franchise obligations.
Title
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicles, including the surrender or transfer of registration plates and cards to a county treasurer, documentary fees charged by motor vehicle dealers, and motor vehicle franchise obligations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2334. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2020 2:30PM RM 315. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Breitbach, Lykam, and Shipley. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB526 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 278.
HF2408 (Replaced by) 2020-03-10 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF2334 (Replaced by) 2020-03-03 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Dawson, and Giddens. S.J. 503.
HF2408 (Replaced by) 2020-03-10 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF2334 (Replaced by) 2020-03-03 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Dawson, and Giddens. S.J. 503.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3015 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3015.html |