IA SF2334 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Dawson, and Giddens. S.J. 503.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Dawson, and Giddens. S.J. 503.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicles, including the surrender or transfer of registration plates and cards to a county treasurer, documentary fees charged by motor vehicle dealers, and motor vehicle franchise obligations. (Formerly SSB 3015.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicles, including the surrender or transfer of registration plates and cards to a county treasurer, documentary fees charged by motor vehicle dealers, and motor vehicle franchise obligations. (Formerly SSB 3015.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Subcommittee: R. Smith, Dawson, and Giddens. S.J. 503. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 407. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 363. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 353. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3015 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2334.
HSB526 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 278.
HF2408 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB526 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 278.
HF2408 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2334 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2334.html |