IA SSB3002 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2104
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2094
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2094
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Reported out of committee as SF 2094.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Reported out of committee as SF 2094.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating a special minor's farm driver's license, and providing penalties.
Title
A bill for an act creating a special minor's farm driver's license, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reported out of committee as SF 2094. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2020 1:00PM RM G17. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Kinney, and Shipley. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB527 (Related) 2020-01-17 - Subcommittee: Huseman, Thorup and Williams. H.J. 112.
HF2104 (Replaced by) 2020-01-27 - Sponsor added, McKean. H.J. 139.
SF2094 (Replaced by) 2020-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2104 (Replaced by) 2020-01-27 - Sponsor added, McKean. H.J. 139.
SF2094 (Replaced by) 2020-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3002 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3002.html |