IA SF2094 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating a special minor's farm driver's license, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 3002.)
Title
A bill for an act creating a special minor's farm driver's license, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 3002.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2020 10:30AM RM G17. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Carlin, and Giddens. S.J. 468. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 407. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 167. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 157. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3002 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Reported out of committee as SF 2094.
HSB527 (Related) 2020-01-17 - Subcommittee: Huseman, Thorup and Williams. H.J. 112.
HF2104 (Similar To) 2020-01-27 - Sponsor added, McKean. H.J. 139.
HSB527 (Related) 2020-01-17 - Subcommittee: Huseman, Thorup and Williams. H.J. 112.
HF2104 (Similar To) 2020-01-27 - Sponsor added, McKean. H.J. 139.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2094 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2094.html |