IA SSB1281 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF499
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Voted - Appropriations.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Voted - Appropriations.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
A study bill for an act making appropriations to the department of cultural affairs, the economic development authority, the Iowa finance authority, the public employment relations board, the department of workforce development, and the state board of regents and certain regents institutions, modifying the redevelopment tax credit, and providing for other properly related matters.
Title
A study bill for an act making appropriations to the department of cultural affairs, the economic development authority, the Iowa finance authority, the public employment relations board, the department of workforce development, and the state board of regents and certain regents institutions, modifying the redevelopment tax credit, and providing for other properly related matters.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Senate | Voted - Appropriations. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Appropriations: Dotzler Chair,Dvorsky, and Schneider. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | In Appropriations |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SF499 (Replaced by) 2015-07-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1134.