IA SF499 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1134.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1134.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act making appropriations to the department of cultural affairs, the economic development authority, the Iowa finance authority, the public employment relations board, the department of workforce development, and the state board of regents and certain regents institutions, modifying programs and duties of the economic development authority, providing for other properly related matters, and including effective date and retroactive and other applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1281.) Item vetoed. Effective 7-2-15.
Title
A bill for an act making appropriations to the department of cultural affairs, the economic development authority, the Iowa finance authority, the public employment relations board, the department of workforce development, and the state board of regents and certain regents institutions, modifying programs and duties of the economic development authority, providing for other properly related matters, and including effective date and retroactive and other applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1281.) Item vetoed. Effective 7-2-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - Passed House (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - Passed House (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1134. |
2015-07-02 | House | Item veto. S.J. 1134. |
2015-06-05 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1131. |
2015-06-05 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1131. |
2015-06-04 | House | Message from House. S.J. 1088. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Immediate message. H.J. 1139. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Explanations of votes. H.J. 1150. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Passed House, ayes 83, nays 8. H.J. 1138. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted. H.J. 1138. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Message from Senate. H.J. 1136. |
2015-06-04 | House | Immediate message. S.J. 1088. |
2015-06-04 | House | Passed Senate, ayes 27, nays 23. S.J. 1087. |
2015-06-04 | House | Conference committee report adopted. S.J. 1087. |
2015-06-03 | House | Conference committee report filed. H.J. 1132. |
2015-06-03 | House | Conference committee report filed. S.J. 1083. |
2015-05-07 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1035. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1004. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Senate conference committee appointed, Dotzler, Bisignano, Hart, Schneider, and Smith. S.J. 1004. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1003. |
2015-05-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1031. |
2015-05-06 | House | House conference committee appointed Deyoe, Baxter, Hanusa, Running-Marquardt, and Finkenauer. H.J. 1030. |
2015-05-06 | House | House insisted. H.J. 1030. |
2015-05-06 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1029. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 993. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate refused to concur with S-3159. S.J. 992. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3159. S.J. 979. |
2015-05-05 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1013. |
2015-06-03 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1132. |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed House, ayes 57, nays 42. H.J. 1004. |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee amendment H-1299 as amended, adopted. H.J. 1004. |
2015-05-05 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-1327 to committee amendment H-1299. H.J. 1003. |
2015-05-05 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-1327 to committee amendment H-1299 not germane. H.J. 1003. |
2015-05-05 | House | Amendment H-1327 to committee amendment H-1299 filed. H.J. 1003. |
2015-05-05 | House | Amendment H-1320 to committee amendment H-1299 adopted. H.J. 1003. |
2015-05-05 | House | Amendment H-1320 to committee amendment H-1299 filed. H.J. 1002. |
2015-05-05 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 1002. |
2015-05-05 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1319 to committee amendment H-1299. H.J. 1001. |
2015-06-05 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-1319 to committee amendment H-1299. H.J. 1001. |
2015-05-05 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-1319 to committee amendment H-1299 not germane. H.J. 1001. |
2015-05-05 | House | Amendment H-1319 to committee amendment H-1299 filed. H.J. 1000. |
2015-05-05 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 1000. |
2015-05-05 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1316 to committee amendment H-1299. H.J. 1000. |
2015-05-05 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-1316 to committee amendment H-1299. |
2015-05-05 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-1316 to committee amendment H-1299 not germane. H.J. 999. |
2015-05-05 | House | Amendment H-1316 to committee amendment H-1299 filed. H.J. 999. |
2015-05-05 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 999. |
2015-05-05 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1326 to committee amendment H-1299. H.J. 998. |
2015-05-05 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-1326 to committee amendment H-1299. H.J. 998. |
2015-05-05 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-1326 to committee amendment H-1299 not germane. H.J. 998. |
2015-05-05 | House | Amendment H-1326 to committee amendment H-1299 filed. H.J. 998. |
2015-05-05 | House | Amendment H-1315 to committee amendment H-1299 lost. H.J. 998. |
2015-05-05 | House | Amendment H-1315 to committee amendment H-1299 filed. H.J. 997. |
2015-05-05 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 997. |
2015-05-05 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1317 to committee amendment H-1299. H.J. 996. |
2015-05-05 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-1317 to committee amendment H-1299. H.J. 996. |
2015-05-05 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-1317 to committee amendment H-1299 not germane. H.J. 996. |
2015-05-05 | House | Amendment H-1317 to committee amendment H-1299 filed. H.J. 996. |
2015-05-05 | House | Amendment H-1322 to committee amendment H-1299 filed, adopted. H.J. 995. |
2015-04-30 | House | Committee amendment H-1299 filed. H.J. 972. |
2015-04-30 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 970. |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-04-30 | House | Subcommittee, Deyoe, Baxter, Bennett, Carlson, Finkenauer, Hanusa, Kressig, Running-Marquardt, and Sheets. H.J. 969. |
2015-04-29 | House | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 939. |
2015-04-29 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 938. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 944. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 24. S.J. 944. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 924. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 922. |