IA SSB1257 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF614
Note: Legislation replaced by HF895
Note: Legislation replaced by HF895
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 614.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 614.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act appropriating federal moneys made available from federal block grants and other nonstate sources, allocating portions of federal block grants, and providing procedures if federal moneys or federal block grants are more or less than anticipated, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See SF 614.)
Title
A bill for an act appropriating federal moneys made available from federal block grants and other nonstate sources, allocating portions of federal block grants, and providing procedures if federal moneys or federal block grants are more or less than anticipated, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See SF 614.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 614. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/27/2021 12:15PM RM 24A. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Subcommittee: Kraayenbrink, Bolkcom, and Lofgren. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
SF614 (Replaced by) 2021-05-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1116.
HSB276 (Related) 2021-05-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 1077.
HF895 (Replaced by) 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1212.
HSB276 (Related) 2021-05-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 1077.
HF895 (Replaced by) 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1212.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1257 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1257.html |