IA SF614 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1116.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1116.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act appropriating federal moneys made available from federal block grants and other nonstate sources, allocating portions of federal block grants, and providing procedures if federal moneys or federal block grants are more or less than anticipated, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 1257.)
Title
A bill for an act appropriating federal moneys made available from federal block grants and other nonstate sources, allocating portions of federal block grants, and providing procedures if federal moneys or federal block grants are more or less than anticipated, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 1257.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 1116. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | HF 895 substituted. S.J. 1114. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3226 adopted. S.J. 1114. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Amendment S-3226 filed. S.J. 1111. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 895. S.J. 1050. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 1017. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 1015. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1257 (Related) 2021-04-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 614.
HSB276 (Related) 2021-05-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 1077.
HF895 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1212.
HSB276 (Related) 2021-05-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 1077.
HF895 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1212.