IA SSB1211 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF559
Note: Legislation replaced by HF725
Note: Legislation replaced by HF725
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 559.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 559.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act making appropriations to the economic development authority, the Iowa finance authority, the public employment relations board, the department of workforce development, and the state board of regents and certain regents institutions, and providing for properly related matters.(See SF 559.)
Title
A bill for an act making appropriations to the economic development authority, the Iowa finance authority, the public employment relations board, the department of workforce development, and the state board of regents and certain regents institutions, and providing for properly related matters.(See SF 559.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 559. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Subcommittee: Lofgren, Alons, Celsi, Costello, Donahue, Dotzler, Edler, Garrett, Giddens, Green, Guth, Koelker, Kraayenbrink, Petersen, Reichman, Rowley, Taylor, J., Taylor, T., Winckler, and Zumbach. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
SF559 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1088.
HSB249 (Related) 2023-05-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 725.
HF725 (Replaced by) 2023-05-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1027.
HSB249 (Related) 2023-05-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 725.
HF725 (Replaced by) 2023-05-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1027.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1211 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1211.html |