IA SSB1196 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF513
Note: Legislation replaced by HF654
Note: Legislation replaced by HF654
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-14 - Subcommittee: Subcommittee of the Whole.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-14 - Subcommittee: Subcommittee of the Whole.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act making appropriations to the department of cultural affairs, the economic development authority, the Iowa finance authority, the public employment relations board, the department of workforce development, and the state board of regents and certain regents institutions, and properly related matters.
Title
A bill for an act making appropriations to the department of cultural affairs, the economic development authority, the Iowa finance authority, the public employment relations board, the department of workforce development, and the state board of regents and certain regents institutions, and properly related matters.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Subcommittee of the Whole. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | NOBA: Joint Subcommittee |
2017-04-13 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT APPROPRIATIONS SUBCOMMITTEE |
Same As/Similar To
SF513 (Replaced by) 2017-05-12 - NOBA: Graybook
HF654 (Replaced by) 2017-04-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1097.
HSB205 (Related) 2017-04-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1075.
HF654 (Replaced by) 2017-04-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1097.
HSB205 (Related) 2017-04-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1075.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1196 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1196.html |