IA SF513 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Item vetoed, signed by Governor S.J. 1138.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act making appropriations to the department of cultural affairs, the economic development authority, the Iowa finance authority, the public employment relations board, the department of workforce development, and the state board of regents and certain regents institutions, and properly related matters. (Formerly SSB 1196.) Item vetoed. Various effective dates; see section 49 of bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act making appropriations to the department of cultural affairs, the economic development authority, the Iowa finance authority, the public employment relations board, the department of workforce development, and the state board of regents and certain regents institutions, and properly related matters. (Formerly SSB 1196.) Item vetoed. Various effective dates; see section 49 of bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-19 - House - Passed House (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateItem vetoed, signed by Governor S.J. 1138.
2017-04-25SenateSent to Governor. S.J. 1134.
2017-04-25SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1134.
2017-04-19SenateMessage from House. S.J. 1094.
2017-04-19HouseImmediate message. H.J. 1097.
2017-04-20HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1114.
2017-04-19HousePassed House, ayes 57, nays 40. H.J. 1097.
2017-04-19HouseSubstituted for HF 654. H.J. 1096.
2017-04-19HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 1088.
2017-04-19HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 1088.
2017-04-19SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1073.
2017-04-19SenatePassed Senate, ayes 31, nays 19. S.J. 1070.
2017-04-19SenatePoint of order raised on S-3355, ruled out of order. S.J. 1070.
2017-04-19SenateAmendment S-3355 filed. S.J. 1070.
2017-04-19SenatePoint of order raised on S-3338, ruled out of order. S.J. 1069.
2017-04-18SenateAmendment S-3338 filed. S.J. 1061.
2017-04-17SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 1041.
2017-04-17SenateIntroduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 1040.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback