IA HF654 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1097.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1097.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act making appropriations to the department of cultural affairs, the economic development authority, the Iowa finance authority, the public employment relations board, the department of workforce development, and the state board of regents and certain regents institutions, and properly related matters. (Formerly HSB 205.)
Title
A bill for an act making appropriations to the department of cultural affairs, the economic development authority, the Iowa finance authority, the public employment relations board, the department of workforce development, and the state board of regents and certain regents institutions, and properly related matters. (Formerly HSB 205.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 1097. |
2017-04-19 | House | SF 513 substituted. H.J. 1096. |
2017-04-20 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1114. |
2017-04-19 | House | Amendment H-1413 lost. H.J. 1096. |
2017-04-19 | House | Amendment H-1413 filed. H.J. 1095. |
2017-04-19 | House | Amendment H-1412 filed, lost. H.J. 1095. |
2017-04-19 | House | Asked and received unanimous consent for immediate consideration. H.J. 1095. |
2017-04-18 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 1043. |
2017-04-17 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1196 (Related) 2017-04-14 - Subcommittee: Subcommittee of the Whole.
HSB205 (Related) 2017-04-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1075.
SF513 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - NOBA: Graybook
HSB205 (Related) 2017-04-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1075.
SF513 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - NOBA: Graybook
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF654 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF654.html |