IA SSB1178 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF476
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 476.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 476.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to qualified immunity of law enforcement officers, the peace officer, public safety, and emergency personnel bill of rights, and protected information of law enforcement officers and state or federal judicial officers and prosecutors.(See SF 476.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to qualified immunity of law enforcement officers, the peace officer, public safety, and emergency personnel bill of rights, and protected information of law enforcement officers and state or federal judicial officers and prosecutors.(See SF 476.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 476. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2021 10:00AM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Boulton, and Dawson. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF476 (Replaced by) 2021-05-20 - Rereferred to Public Safety. H.J. 1203.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1178 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1178.html |