IA SF476 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Rereferred to Public Safety. H.J. 1203.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Rereferred to Public Safety. H.J. 1203.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to qualified immunity, the peace officer, public safety, and emergency personnel bill of rights, uniform commercial code filings, and protected information of law enforcement officers and state or federal judicial officers and prosecutors, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1178.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to qualified immunity, the peace officer, public safety, and emergency personnel bill of rights, uniform commercial code filings, and protected information of law enforcement officers and state or federal judicial officers and prosecutors, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1178.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3055 to amendment S–3049 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3054 to amendment S–3049 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3049 be adopted? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3055 to amendment S–3049 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3054 to amendment S–3049 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3049 be adopted? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Rereferred to Public Safety. H.J. 1203. |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 920. |
2021-04-05 | House | Amendment H-1345 filed. H.J. 884. |
2021-04-02 | House | Amendment H-1341 filed. H.J. 882. |
2021-04-01 | House | Amendment H-1336 filed. H.J. 879. |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 831. |
2021-03-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1 |
2021-03-23 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/24/2021 8:00AM House Lounge 1. |
2021-03-23 | House | Subcommittee: Holt, Steckman and Worthan. H.J. 830. |
2021-03-10 | House | Read first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 683. |
2021-03-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 648. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 547. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 36, nays 12. S.J. 546. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3052, ruled out of order. S.J. 546. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3052 filed. S.J. 546. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3050 filed, ruled out of order. S.J. 546. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3049 adopted. S.J. 545. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3056 to S-3049 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 545. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3051 filed, ruled out of order. S.J. 545. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3055 to S-3049 filed, lost. S.J. 544. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3054 to S-3049 filed, lost. S.J. 544. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 533. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3049 filed. S.J. 533. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 475. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 467. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1178 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 476.