IA SSB1168 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF366
Note: Legislation replaced by SF617

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to gambling regulation and wagering, by providing for sports wagering and fantasy sports contests, providing for taxes and fees, making penalties applicable, and including implementation and effective date provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to gambling regulation and wagering, by providing for sports wagering and fantasy sports contests, providing for taxes and fees, making penalties applicable, and including implementation and effective date provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2019-02-18SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2019 5:00PM RM 116.
2019-02-18SenateSubcommittee: Smith, R., Bisignano and Dawson.
2019-02-18SenateBy COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

SF366 (Replaced by) 2019-04-04 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF617 (Replaced by) 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback