IA SF617 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to gambling regulation and wagering, by providing for sports wagering and fantasy sports contests, providing for taxes and fees, making penalties applicable, and including implementation and effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1168, SF 366.) Various effective dates; see sections 23, 46, and 52 of bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to gambling regulation and wagering, by providing for sports wagering and fantasy sports contests, providing for taxes and fees, making penalties applicable, and including implementation and effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1168, SF 366.) Various effective dates; see sections 23, 46, and 52 of bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-05-06SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
2019-04-23SenateMessage from House. S.J. 1048.
2019-04-23HouseFiscal note.
2019-04-22HouseImmediate message. H.J. 945.
2019-04-22HousePassed House, yeas 67 nays 31. H.J. 940.
2019-04-22HouseAmendment H-1260 filed, lost. H.J. 939.
2019-04-22HouseAmendment H-1261 lost. H.J. 939.
2019-04-22HouseAmendment H-1261 filed. H.J. 938.
2019-04-22HouseAmendment H-1263 lost. H.J. 938.
2019-04-22HouseAmendment H-1263 filed. H.J. 937.
2019-04-22HouseAmendment H-1262 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 937.
2019-04-22HouseSubstituted for HF 748. H.J. 936.
2019-04-22HouseFiscal note, as amended and passed by the Senate.
2019-04-18HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 903.
2019-04-18HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 903.
2019-04-17SenateImmediate message. S.J. 997.
2019-04-17SenatePassed Senate, yeas 31, nays 18. S.J. 997.
2019-04-17SenateAmendment S-3182 filed, adopted. S.J. 997.
2019-04-17SenateAmendment S-3176 filed, adopted. S.J. 996.
2019-04-17SenateFiscal note, revised.
2019-04-17SenateFiscal note.
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 890.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 889.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1168 (Related) 2019-02-20 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF366 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback