IA SF366 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 617. S.J. 890.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 617. S.J. 890.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to gambling regulation and wagering, by providing for sports wagering and fantasy sports contests, providing for taxes and fees, making penalties applicable, and including implementation and effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1168; See SF 617.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to gambling regulation and wagering, by providing for sports wagering and fantasy sports contests, providing for taxes and fees, making penalties applicable, and including implementation and effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1168; See SF 617.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 617. S.J. 890. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: R. Smith, Dawson, and Jochum. S.J. 407. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 394. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 392. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 386. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1168 (Related) 2019-02-20 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF617 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
SF617 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF366 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF366.html |