IA SSB1144 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF468
Note: Legislation replaced by SF447
Note: Legislation replaced by SF447
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for certain court actions involving an allegation of a public or private nuisance or the interference with a person’s comfortable use and enjoyment of life or property caused by an animal feeding operation, providing for the award of damages, costs, and expenses, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act providing for certain court actions involving an allegation of a public or private nuisance or the interference with a person’s comfortable use and enjoyment of life or property caused by an animal feeding operation, providing for the award of damages, costs, and expenses, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 12:00PM Room 206 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zumbach, Shipley, and Kinney. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
HF468 (Replaced by) 2017-03-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 754.
SF447 (Replaced by) 2017-03-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 823.
HSB134 (Related) 2017-02-27 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 471.
SF447 (Replaced by) 2017-03-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 823.
HSB134 (Related) 2017-02-27 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 471.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1144 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1144.html |