IA SF447 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 823.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act providing for certain court actions involving an allegation of a public or private nuisance or the interference with a person’s comfortable use and enjoyment of life or property caused by an animal feeding operation, providing for the award of damages, costs, and expenses, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1144.) Effective 3-29-17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act providing for certain court actions involving an allegation of a public or private nuisance or the interference with a person’s comfortable use and enjoyment of life or property caused by an animal feeding operation, providing for the award of damages, costs, and expenses, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1144.) Effective 3-29-17.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29SenateSigned by Governor. S.J. 823.
2017-03-28SenateSent to Governor. S.J. 805.
2017-03-28SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 805.
2017-03-23SenateMessage from House. S.J. 739.
2017-03-22HouseImmediate message. H.J. 754.
2017-03-22HousePassed House, ayes 60, nays 39. H.J. 718.
2017-03-22HouseSubstituted for HF 468. H.J. 717.
2017-03-15HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 656.
2017-03-15HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 647.
2017-03-14SenateImmediate message. S.J. 603.
2017-03-14SenatePassed Senate, ayes 31, nays 18. S.J. 599.
2017-03-14SenateAmendment S-3152 filed, lost. S.J. 598.
2017-03-14SenateAmendment S-3155 filed, lost. S.J. 598.
2017-03-14SenateAmendment S-3154 filed, lost. S.J. 597.
2017-03-14SenateAmendment S-3122 adopted. S.J. 597.
2017-03-14SenateAmendment S-3153 filed, lost. S.J. 596.
2017-03-14SenateAmendment S-3141 filed, lost. S.J. 595.
2017-03-13SenateAmendment S-3122 filed. S.J. 581.
2017-03-06SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 476.
2017-03-06SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 474.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback