IA HF468 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 754.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 754.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for certain court actions involving an allegation of a public or private nuisance or the interference with a person’s comfortable use and enjoyment of life or property caused by an animal feeding operation, providing for the award of damages, costs, and expenses, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 134.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for certain court actions involving an allegation of a public or private nuisance or the interference with a person’s comfortable use and enjoyment of life or property caused by an animal feeding operation, providing for the award of damages, costs, and expenses, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 134.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 754. |
2017-03-22 | House | SF 447 substituted. H.J. 717. |
2017-03-22 | House | Amendment H-1203 adopted. H.J. 716. |
2017-03-15 | House | Amendment H-1203 filed. H.J. 668. |
2017-02-28 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 478. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB134 (Related) 2017-02-27 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 471.
SSB1144 (Related) 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF447 (Similar To) 2017-03-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 823.
SSB1144 (Related) 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF447 (Similar To) 2017-03-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 823.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF468 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF468.html |