IA SSB1115 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 311.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 311.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for programs and regulations administered and enforced by the department of agriculture and land stewardship, providing fees, providing for the allocation of moneys, and making penalties applicable.(See SF 311.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for programs and regulations administered and enforced by the department of agriculture and land stewardship, providing fees, providing for the allocation of moneys, and making penalties applicable.(See SF 311.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 311. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2023 1:00PM Room G15. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee: Gruenhagen, Boulton, and Zumbach. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Agriculture. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB113 (Related) 2023-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 277.
HF277 (Replaced by) 2023-04-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 805.
SF311 (Replaced by) 2023-05-02 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1021.
HF666 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
HF277 (Replaced by) 2023-04-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 805.
SF311 (Replaced by) 2023-05-02 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1021.
HF666 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1115 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1115.html |